This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2020 at 08:41:07 (UTC).

GARY NEVILLE VS ARNOLD CLOMERA

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 GARY NEVILLE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARNOLD CLOMERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8329

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEVILLE GARY

Defendant

CLOMERA ARNOLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PURITSKY ERIC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/26/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/26/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/26/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • Hearing10/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gary Neville (Plaintiff); As to: Arnold Clomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gary Neville (Plaintiff); As to: Arnold Clomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gary Neville (Plaintiff); As to: Arnold Clomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PURITSKY ERIC