This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2020 at 02:11:51 (UTC).

GARY LUTHER WILLIAMS VS RICARDO HURTADO

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 GARY LUTHER WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICARDO HURTADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2638

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS GARY LUTHER

Defendant

HURTADO RICARDO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/23/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by GARY LUTHER WILLIAMS on 09/23/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 11/06/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: GARY LUTHER WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); As to: RICARDO HURTADO (Defendant); Service Cost: 63.90; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: GARY LUTHER WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); As to: RICARDO HURTADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less