This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 02:24:47 (UTC).

GARY ANDRASSY VS YOLANDA ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 GARY ANDRASSY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOLANDA ESTRADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1512

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDRASSY GARY

Defendant

ESTRADA YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARPEL DONALD

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Gary Andrassy on motion to be relived as counsel

9/16/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Gary Andrassy on motion to be relived as counsel

Response (name extension) - Response to Objection Re: Motion to be Relieved

10/6/2020: Response (name extension) - Response to Objection Re: Motion to be Relieved

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Errata

10/6/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Errata

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

10/13/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/13/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to motion to be relived as counsel

9/8/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to motion to be relived as counsel

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

9/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/10/2020

9/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/10/2020

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/12/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/12/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/12/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

5/13/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/18/2019: Complaint - Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Hearing06/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Donald Karpel (Attorney); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Donald Karpel (Attorney); As to: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Errata; Filed by: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketResponse to Objection Re: Motion to be Relieved; Filed by: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Gary Andrassy on motion to be relived as counsel; Filed by: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/12/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Donald Karpel (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gary Andrassy (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11512    Hearing Date: October 13, 2020    Dept: 26

Andrassy v. Estrada., et al

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Donald Karpel, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Gary Andrassy is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF CORRECTED AND SIGNED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

Case Number: 19STLC11512    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Donald Karpel, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Gary Andrassy is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. THIS RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF CORRECTED, SIGNED ORDERS UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.