This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 23:45:47 (UTC).

GARCIA, RICHARD VS. CARDIFF, JASON

Case Summary

On 03/05/2013 GARCIA, RICHARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARDIFF, JASON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0228

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA RICHARD

Defendant

CARDIFF JASON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/27/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM POM13S00228 TO ALH13SR0228

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO MANAGER RE: DISMISSAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DISMISSAL CLERK RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 581 C.C.P.,THE COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE CAS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • PURSUANT TO 581 C.C.P , THE COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED AND FILED; COPY MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DATA ENTRY RE: UPCOMING CALENDAR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN POM448028005. HEARING SET FOR 05/10/13 AT 10:30 AM IN DPT. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less