This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 17:54:08 (UTC).

GARCIA, MARCELO VS BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LP

Case Summary

On 07/02/2013 GARCIA, MARCELO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9147

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA MARCELO

Defendant

BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MORSE MEHRBAN A P C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/02/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • DocketOSC SET 07/05/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less