This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 06:16:11 (UTC).

GARCIA, MARCELO VS BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES L P

Case Summary

On 12/31/2014 GARCIA, MARCELO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6837

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA MARCELO

Defendant

BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES L P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MORSE MEHRBAN A P C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT CODE #130 $225.00 CCH420411010 BY PLAINTIFF FILED. CIVIL DEPOSIT CODE #130 $225.00 CCH420411010 BY PLAINTIFF FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION FILED. DECLARATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT $863.00; INTEREST $73.55; MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT $863.00; INTEREST $73.55; BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REJECT FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 8/30/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketABSTRACT ISSUED. ATTORNEY SERVICE. CM ABSTRACT ISSUED. ATTORNEY SERVICE. CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketCASE SUMMARY, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, INTEREST COMPUTATION AND CASE SUMMARY, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, INTEREST COMPUTATION AND DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/30/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - CIVIL RIGHTS/DISCRIMINIATION FILED Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketOSC SET 01/02/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -CASE FILING FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketFEE WAIVER GRANTED IN WHOLE FEE WAIVER GRANTED IN WHOLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less