This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 20:18:36 (UTC).

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY VS ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4121

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY

Defendants

ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC.

OAK PARK MANOR LP

TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILER NORMAN ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

PITRE RANDALL JOHN

MURPHY BRANDON CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

4/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 04/09/2019

4/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 04/09/2019

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Norman A. Filer in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions

4/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Norman A. Filer in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Case Management Statement

6/13/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - Case Management Statement

Other - (name extension)

9/7/2018: Other - (name extension)

Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)

9/28/2018: Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

3/16/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

3/16/2018: Complaint

Notice of Related Case

6/1/2018: Notice of Related Case

Answer

6/1/2018: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/11/2018: Answer

Notice of Related Case

5/11/2018: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ganahl Lumber Company on 03/16/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J updated: Result Date to 07/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J updated: Result Date to 07/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J updated: Result Date to 07/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Norman A. Filer in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 04/09/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/25/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Framing Structures, Inc. (Defendant); Oak Park Manor, LP (Defendant); Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

1 || Norman A. Filer, Esq. (Bar No. 103305)

Orangé, Ca;e 9C2%1éc§ge Blvd., Suite 1270 ounty of Los lvflngeles

3 || T: (714) 634-1717 F: (714) 634-2855 VAR 18 2018

* | Attomeys for Plaintift i?Wfl:fi"‘

5 || GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY Victor Sino-Cruz

7 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 8 FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES—STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE 9 1887

10 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY, CASE NO.Plaintiffs, 12 || s, COMPLAINT FOR MONEY ON BREACH

OF CONTRACT, COMMON COUNTS AND 13 || ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'’S LIEN INC.; OAK PARK MANOR, LP; 14 || TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC.; and DOES 1 through 200, Inclusive, Limited Jurisdiction — Over $10,000.00

Defendants.

17 || Plaintiff alleges as follows:

18 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION |

19 (Breach of Contract Against ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC.

20 and Does 1 through 10)

21 || 1. Plaintiff is and at all times herein mentioned was a corporation authorized to transact 22 business in the State of California.

23 || 2. This county and judicial district are the proper venue for this lawsuit since certain real 24 property which is the subject of the mechanic’s lien foreclosure cause of action herein is 25 situated in the City of Claremont, County of Los Angeles.

26 || 3. Plaintiff is informed and believes and thereon alleges that Defendant, ADVANCED 27 FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC. (“ADVANCED") is a corporation with its principal place

x., 28 of business located in the County of Riverside.