This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 20:18:36 (UTC).

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY VS ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY against ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4121

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY

Defendants

ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC.

OAK PARK MANOR LP

TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

4/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 04/09/2019

4/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 04/09/2019

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Norman A. Filer in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions

4/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Norman A. Filer in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions

Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)

9/28/2018: Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Related Case

6/1/2018: Notice of Related Case

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

5/11/2018: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/25/2018

4/25/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/25/2018

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ganahl Lumber Company on 03/16/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J updated: Result Date to 07/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J updated: Result Date to 07/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J updated: Result Date to 07/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Norman A. Filer in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 04/09/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/25/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Framing Structures, Inc. (Defendant); Oak Park Manor, LP (Defendant); Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

1 || Norman A. Filer, Esq. (Bar No. 103305)

Orangé, Ca;e 9C2%1éc§ge Blvd., Suite 1270 ounty of Los lvflngeles

3 || T: (714) 634-1717 F: (714) 634-2855 VAR 18 2018

* | Attomeys for Plaintift i?Wfl:fi"‘

5 || GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY Victor Sino-Cruz

7 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 8 FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES—STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE 9 1887

10 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY, CASE NO.Plaintiffs, 12 || s, COMPLAINT FOR MONEY ON BREACH

OF CONTRACT, COMMON COUNTS AND 13 || ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'’S LIEN INC.; OAK PARK MANOR, LP; 14 || TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC.; and DOES 1 through 200, Inclusive, Limited Jurisdiction — Over $10,000.00

Defendants.

17 || Plaintiff alleges as follows:

18 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION |

19 (Breach of Contract Against ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC.

20 and Does 1 through 10)

21 || 1. Plaintiff is and at all times herein mentioned was a corporation authorized to transact 22 business in the State of California.

23 || 2. This county and judicial district are the proper venue for this lawsuit since certain real 24 property which is the subject of the mechanic’s lien foreclosure cause of action herein is 25 situated in the City of Claremont, County of Los Angeles.

26 || 3. Plaintiff is informed and believes and thereon alleges that Defendant, ADVANCED 27 FRAMING STRUCTURES, INC. (“ADVANCED") is a corporation with its principal place

x., 28 of business located in the County of Riverside.