This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2020 at 01:42:18 (UTC).

GAIN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FKA BURBANK CITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS JACQUELINE SAGORY TAPIA

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 GAIN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FKA BURBANK CITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACQUELINE SAGORY TAPIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8517

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAIN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FKA BURBANK CITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

TAPIA JACQUELINE SAGORY AKA JACQUELINE SAGORY AKA JACQUELINE TAPIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARWACKI JR. RAY

Defendant Attorney

STARRETT II CARL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

8/12/2020: Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Amended

8/12/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Amended

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/22/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

10/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/9/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/10/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/10/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

General Denial - General Denial

10/30/2019: General Denial - General Denial

Complaint - Complaint

9/16/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/16/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/16/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Hearing03/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Carl Starrett II (Attorney); As to: Jacqueline Sagory Tapia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 10/22/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by: Jacqueline Sagory Tapia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Amended; Filed by: Carl Starrett II (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 08/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/22/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Gain Federal Credit Union fka Burbank City Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sagory Tapia (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Jacqueline Sagory Tapia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gain Federal Credit Union fka Burbank City Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sagory Tapia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gain Federal Credit Union fka Burbank City Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sagory Tapia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gain Federal Credit Union fka Burbank City Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sagory Tapia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC08517    Hearing Date: October 22, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:    Thu., October 22, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME Gain Federal Credit Union v. Tapia

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC08517  COMP. FILED: 09-16-19

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 02-13-21

  MOTION C/O: 02-22-21

TRIAL DATE: 03-15-21

PROCEEDINGS    MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

MOVING PARTY:   Defendant’s Counsel Tyneia Merritt

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC rule 3.162)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant’s Counsel Tyneia Merritt’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED and the proposed order will be signed at the hearing. “After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).) Defendant] has been filed with the court.” (Id.)

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of October 20, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of October 20, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On September 16, 2019, Plaintiff Gain Federal Credit Union (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract, money lent, and account stated against Defendant Jacqueline Tapia aka Jacqueline Sagory aka Jaqueline Sagory Tapia (“Defendant”). On October 30, 2019, Defendant filed an Answer.

On April 10, 2020, Defendant’s attorney Tyneia Merritt (“Counsel”) with the National Litigation Law Group filed the instant Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (the “Motion”).

At the initial August 10, 2020 hearing, the Court noted that Counsel’s supporting declaration stated both that she confirmed Defendant’s current address via return receipt and that she was unable to confirm Defendant’s address despite mailing the Motion to the last known address with return receipt requested, calling Defendant’s last known number, and emailing Defendant. (8/10/20 Minute Order.) Counsel was thus ordered to file supplemental papers correcting the error. (Id.) On August 12, 2020, Counsel filed an amended supporting declaration.

To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

(B) The service address is the last known residence or business address of the client and the attorney has been unable to locate a more current address after making reasonable efforts to do so within 30 days before the filing of the motion to be relieved.

  1. Discussion

Defendant’s Counsel seeks to be relieved due to a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. (8/12/20 MC-052, ¶ 2.) Counsel served Defendant with the Motion, supporting declaration, and proposed order by mail at Defendant’s last known address which Counsel was unable to confirm was current despite mailing the Motion with a return receipt requested, calling Defendant’s last known phone number, and emailing Defendant. (Id. at ¶ 3(b).) 

The Court is satisfied with Counsel’s reasons for seeking to be relieved and finds that she has satisfied the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362, subdivision (a) and (c)-(e). Importantly, trial is set for March 15, 2021, giving Defendant sufficient time to seek other counsel should she wish to obtain new representation.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant’s Counsel Tyneia Merritt’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED and the proposed order will be signed at the hearing. “After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).) Defendant] has been filed with the court.” (Id.)

Defendant’s Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC08517    Hearing Date: August 10, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Mon., August 10, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Gain Federal Credit Union v. Tapia

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC08517 COMP. FILED: 09-16-19

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 02-13-21

MOTION C/O: 02-22-21

TRIAL DATE: 03-15-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

MOVING PARTY: Defendant’s Counsel Tyneia Merritt

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC rule 3.162)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant’s Counsel Tyneia Merritt’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant’s Counsel must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the errors identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of August 6, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of August 6, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On September 16, 2019, Plaintiff Gain Federal Credit Union (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract, money lent, and account stated against Defendant Jacqueline Tapia aka Jacqueline Sagory aka Jaqueline Sagory Tapia (“Defendant”). On October 30, 2019, Defendant filed an Answer.

On April 10, 2020, Defendant’s attorney Tyneia Merritt (“Counsel”) with the National Litigation Law Group filed the instant Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

The court may order that an attorney be changed or substituted at any time before or after judgment or final determination upon request by either client or attorney and after notice from one to the other. (Code Civ. Proc. § 284, subd. (2).) “The determination whether to grant or deny a motion to withdraw as counsel lies within the sound discretion of the trial court.” (Manfredi & Levine v. Superior Court (1998) 66 Cal.App.4th 1128, 1133.) An application to be relieved as counsel must be made on Judicial Counsel Forms MC-051 (Notice of Motion and Motion), MC-052 (Declaration), and MC-053 (Proposed Order). (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362, subds. (a), (c), (e).)

In addition, California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362 subsection (d) requires that the notice of motion and motion, declaration, and proposed order be served on the client and all other parties who have appeared in the case by personal service, electronic service, or mail. If the notice is served by mail, it must be accompanied by a declaration stating facts showing that either:

(A) The service address is the current residence or business address of the client; or

(B) The service address is the last known residence or business address of the client and the attorney has been unable to locate a more current address after making reasonable efforts to do so within 30 days before the filing of the motion to be relieved.

(Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362, subd. (1)(A) & (2).) (Italics added.)

  1. Discussion

Defendant’s Counsel seeks to be relieved due to a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship and because it is in the best interest of Defendant that the attorney-client relationship be terminated. (MC-052, ¶ 2.) The Court is satisfied with Counsel’s reasons for seeking to be relieved. In addition, trial is set for March 15, 2021, giving Defendant sufficient time to seek other counsel should she wish to obtain new representation.

However, Counsel confusingly states both that she confirmed Defendant’s current address via return receipt, and that Counsel has been unable to confirm Defendant’s address despite mailing the Motion to the last known address with return receipt requested, calling Defendant’s last known phone number, and emailing Defendant. (Id. at ¶ 3(a), (b).) Thus, Defendant’s Counsel is ordered to file an amended Form MC-052 correcting this error.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant’s Counsel Tyneia Merritt’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is CONTINUED TO OCTOBER, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant’s Counsel must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the errors identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.