This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 20:25:47 (UTC).

GAIL BLECKMAN VS RYAN KATZENBACH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 GAIL BLECKMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RYAN KATZENBACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1640

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BLECKMAN GAIL

Defendants

AMITYVILLE HOLDINGS INC.

KATZENBACH RYAN DBA KATCO MEDIA

Cross Plaintiff

KATZENBACH RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KERNAN STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Reclassification)

5/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Reclassification)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Payment

4/15/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Payment

Reply (name extension) - Reply In Opp. to Notice of Non-Payment of Reclass. Fee by Def. Katzenbach

4/21/2020: Reply (name extension) - Reply In Opp. to Notice of Non-Payment of Reclass. Fee by Def. Katzenbach

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

3/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Courtroom for Demurrer

3/5/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Courtroom for Demurrer

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition To Pltf/CrossDef Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike

2/27/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition To Pltf/CrossDef Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

2/27/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/13/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition by Defendant to Pltf's Opposition to Demurrer

5/22/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition by Defendant to Pltf's Opposition to Demurrer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/20/2019

6/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/20/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

6/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

5/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 05/30/2019

5/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 05/30/2019

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

5/17/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Demurrer

5/17/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Demurrer

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/13/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Reclassification)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Reclassification) of 05/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 05/13/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held on 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Ryan Katzenbach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketReply In Opp. to Notice of Non-Payment of Reclass. Fee by Def. Katzenbach; Filed by: Ryan Katzenbach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Non-Payment; Filed by: Gail Bleckman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion - Other Costs of Service scheduled for 08/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08/28/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gail Bleckman (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan Katzenbach (Defendant); Amityville Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gail Bleckman (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan Katzenbach (Defendant); Amityville Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gail Bleckman (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan Katzenbach (Defendant); Amityville Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC01640    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 26

Bleckman v. Katzenbach, et al.

DEMURRER; SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

(CCP §§ 430.10, 425.16)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Cross-Defendant Gail Bleckman’s (1) Demurrer to Cross-Complaint; and (2) Special Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint are PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Based on the relief sought in the Cross-Complaint, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Defendant / Cross-Complainant is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

ANALYSIS:

On February 13, 2019, Plaintiff Gail Bleckman (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for accounting against Defendants Ryan Katzenbach dba Katco Media (“Defendant Katzenbach”) and Amityville Holdings, Inc. Amityville Holdings was dismissed by Plaintiff on August 12, 2019. On July 10, 2019, Defendant Katzenbach filed a Cross-Complaint for interference with economic advantage, defamation and unlawful business practices. The Cross-Complaint specifically seeks damages of $50,000.00. (Cross-Compl., ¶33; Prayer, ¶1.)

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court lacks jurisdiction to grant damages in excess of $25,000.00. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subd. (a).) Based on the relief sought, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Defendant Katzenbach is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

Court clerk to give notice.