This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 00:19:34 (UTC).

GABRIELA DOMINGUEZ VS SARAH JONES

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 GABRIELA DOMINGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SARAH JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3780

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMINGUEZ GABRIELA

Defendant

JONES SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABZEVAR FARZAD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/19/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim) of 12/09/2019

12/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim) of 12/09/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim) of 07/10/2019

7/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim) of 07/10/2019

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Rodolfo

7/10/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Rodolfo

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

7/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/16/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

4/16/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim) of 12/09/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim scheduled for 12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim scheduled for 10/23/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/09/2019 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim scheduled for 08/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/23/2019 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Rodolfo: Name Extension changed from for Rodolfo to for Guardian ad litem re: Rodolfo; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim) of 07/10/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Rodolfo - Rejected; Submitted by: Gabriela Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriela Dominguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Rodolfo: Status Date changed from 07/11/2019 to 07/10/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by: Gabriela Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: Sarah Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Rodolfo: Status Date changed from 07/10/2019 to 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03780    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 94

Dominguez v. Jones, et al.

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Gabriela Dominguez on behalf of minor Claimant Rodolfo Escobar to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

On April 16, 2019, Petitioner Gabriela Dominguez (“Petitioner”) filed a Petition to Approve

Compromise of Pending Action (the “Petition”) on behalf of Minor Claimant Rodolfo Escobedo

(“Claimant”). The Petition arises out of a motor vehicle accident involving Respondent Sarah Jones (“Respondent”).

“When a minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, or a person for whom a conservator has been appointed is a party, that person shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 372, subd. (a)(1).) Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc., § 372.)

The matter initially came for hearing on October 23, 2019, at which time the Court found the Petition had not been fully completed. (Minute Order, dated 10/23/19.) The Court therefore continued the hearing to allow Petitioner an opportunity to correct the defects, and ordered Petitioner to file an amended Petition and supplemental papers in the time and manner prescribed by Code of Civil Procedure section 1005. To date, however, no amended Petition or supplemental papers have been filed.

Therefore, the Petition of Gabriela Dominguez on behalf of minor Claimant Rodolfo Escobar to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.