This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 10:20:53 (UTC).

FV REO I VS. GARCIA, NANCY A

Case Summary

On 06/22/2012 FV REO I filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA, NANCY A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. PEARCE and DEBORAH SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1819

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

DEBORAH SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FV REO I LLC

Defendants

GARCIA NANCY A

NAVA JESUS

MARTINEZ ANGEL

GIROM HILDA

RODRIGUEZ SALVADOR

GONZALEZ MIGUEL

PINEDA LAZARO

HERNANDEZ VALENTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLOMON, GRINDLE, SILVERMAN & WINTRINGER - CHRISTOPHER A LIDSTAD

Attorney at SOLOMON, GRINDLE, SILVERMAN & WINTRINGER

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF - SHIPITSYNA, SARAH

LAW OFFICE OF - SHIPITSYNA, SARAH TRUESDELL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2013
  • COPY OF APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LC 12C01819 TO LB 12UF1819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. APPELLATE DEPARTMENT ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER BV030221 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIVED FOR APPELLANT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL SIGNED FOR RESPONDENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION ADDITIONAL FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT (NAVA, JESUS) IS PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES: FOR APPEAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES FILED BY (NAVA, JESUS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2012
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (NAVA, JESUS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES OF (NAVA, JESUS) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT HAS TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WAIVER TO POST THE PROPER FEES WITH THE CLERK`S OFFICE. A REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO THE APPLICANT. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED OF (GARCIA, NANCY A) , (NAVA, JESUS) PRO PER . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (GARCIA, NANCY A) , (NAVA, JESUS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (GARCIA, NANCY A) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • REQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (NAVA, JESUS) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FV REO I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIPITSYNA, SARAH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PUBLIC COUNSEL - SHIPITSYNA, SARAH TRUESDELL