This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 00:36:36 (UTC).

FULTS, AMANDA VS SCOTT, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 FULTS, AMANDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCOTT, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9263

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

FULTS AMANDA

TOPRAK ANDREW

SCOTT MICHELLE DBA 21ST CENTURY HOME LOAN HOME LOAN

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

SCOTT MICHELLE DBA 21ST CENTURY HOME LOAN HOME LOAN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/28/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/20/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/10/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

8/10/2016: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

8/10/2016: Notice of Postponement

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/7/2016: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/7/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Madison Russell (07/26/2016)

10/7/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Madison Russell (07/26/2016)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/12/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice of Postponement

10/12/2016: Notice of Postponement

Minute Order - (Hearing - Other)

12/2/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing - Other)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/5/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/5/2016: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/05/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/5/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/05/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

12/14/2016: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Receipt for Exhibits

12/28/2016: Receipt for Exhibits

Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions

6/29/2017: Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: AMANDA FULTS (Plaintiff); ANDREW TOPRAK (Plaintiff); As to: MICHELLE SCOTT (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 12/14/2016 ; Status Date changed from 12/05/2016 to 12/14/2016 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/05/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (FULTS, AMANDA); Plaintiff (TOPRAK, ANDREW) against Defendant (SCOTT, MICHELLE) DBA (21ST CENTURY HOME LOAN, HOME LOAN) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by FULTS, AMANDA on 10/28/2015 (from DOW15D09263) for the principal amount of $190.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $305.00.; Other: Exhibits to custodian.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by MICHELLE SCOTT on 08/10/2016: Plaintiffs (FULTS, AMANDA); (TOPRAK, ANDREW) do not owe the defendant (SCOTT, MICHELLE) DBA (21ST CENTURY HOME LOAN, HOME LOAN) any money on defendant's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Minute Order (Hearing - Other)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • Hearing - Other scheduled for 12/02/2016 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: MICHELLE SCOTT (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/20/2016 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 06/20/2016; Result Type to Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2016 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/20/2016 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 09/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/20/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SE2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/04/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1151030E1313. HEARING SET FOR 01/21/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SE2.

    Read MoreRead Less