This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2019 at 19:53:24 (UTC).

FUENTES, JOSE DE JESUS VS ROMERO, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 12/21/2012 FUENTES, JOSE DE JESUS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROMERO, CARLOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH HAMMOCK, JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ and STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2714

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH HAMMOCK

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUENTES JOSE DE JESUS

Defendant

ROMERO CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY R. GARCIA - ANTHONY R. GARCIA ESQ

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY R. GARCIA - ANTHONY R GARCIA ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY R. GARCIA

GARCIA ANTHONY R ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 02/24/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. RANDOLPH HAMMOCK PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 12/21/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. RANDOLPH HAMMOCK PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 12/21/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 12/08/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 . COURT TRIAL SET FOR 6/8/15 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. STEPHANIE M. BOWICK, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 06/08/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 . THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 12/21/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. STEPHANIE M. BOWICK, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 06/08/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 . THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. STEPHANIE M. BOWICK, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A PROOF OF SERVICE. . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: COURT TRIAL IS SET ON 07/14/14 AT 08:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 77. PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. PLAINTIFF CALLED THE COURT AT 08:50 A.M. AND WAS INFORMED THAT A COURT TRIAL WAS SET AND WAS ORDERED TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2013
  • Docket* FUTURE HEARING DATE(S) REMAIN THE SAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY COMMISSIONER JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/12/13 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY COMMISSIONER JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/12/13 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM135994020. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE COMM. JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/10/13 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 12/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA ANTHONY R