This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2019 at 14:20:05 (UTC).

FRIENDLY HILLS COUNTRY CLUB VS QUIROS, LORRAINE A

Case Summary

On 09/01/2016 FRIENDLY HILLS COUNTRY CLUB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUIROS, LORRAINE A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5245

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRIENDLY HILLS COUNTRY CLUB A CORPORATION

Defendant

QUIROS LORRAINE A AKA QUIROS LORRAINE AKA LOPEZ LORRAINE A. AKA LOZANO LORRAINE A AKA LOZANO-QUIROZ LORRAINE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEALD DANIEL A

 

Court Documents

Summons

9/1/2016: Summons

Complaint

9/1/2016: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/6/2016: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (QUIROS, LORRAINE A) AKA (QUIROS, LORRAINE) AKA (LOPEZ, LORRAINE A.) AKA (LOZA

11/8/2016: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (QUIROS, LORRAINE A) AKA (QUIROS, LORRAINE) AKA (LOPEZ, LORRAINE A.) AKA (LOZA

Request for Dismissal - Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

1/9/2017: Request for Dismissal - Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

Declaration (name extension) - Re: IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585(D)

1/9/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Re: IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585(D)

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

1/9/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/9/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/24/2017: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Default Judgment

3/21/2017: Default Judgment

Writ of Execution

5/9/2017: Writ of Execution

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/9/2017: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

7/20/2017: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ - Return

2/9/2018: Writ - Return

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

7/19/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

7/26/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Proof of Personal Service

8/21/2018: Proof of Personal Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 10/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling and Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: (FRIENDLY HILLS COUNTRY CLUB) A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketStipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 10/09/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/29/2018 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (FRIENDLY HILLS COUNTRY CLUB) A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: LORRAINE A QUIROS (Defendant); Service Date: 08/08/2018; Service Cost: 62.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by: (FRIENDLY HILLS COUNTRY CLUB) A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: LORRAINE A QUIROS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585(D) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (QUIROS, LORRAINE A) AKA (QUIROS, LORRAINE) AKA (LOPEZ, LORRAINE A.) AKA (LOZANO, LORRAINE A) AKA(LOZANO-QUIROZ, LORRAINE A) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (QUIROS, LORRAINE A) AKA (QUIROS, LORRAINE) AKA (LOPEZ, LORRAINE A.) AKA (LOZANO, LORRAINE A) AKA(LOZANO-QUIROZ, LORRAINE A) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (QUIROS, LORRAINE A) AKA (QUIROS, LORRAINE) AKA (LOPEZ, LORRAINE A.) AKA (LOZANO, LORRAINE A) AKA(LOZANO-QUIROZ, LORRAINE A) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE ON 10/27/16 . COSTS OF $ 62.15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 08/19/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455154004. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (FRIENDLY HILLS COUNTRY CLUB) A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less