This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 06:47:51 (UTC).

FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. VS SAMANTAH LEE-MARIE DELGADO

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAMANTAH LEE-MARIE DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1895

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC

Defendant

DELGADO SAMANTHA LEE-MARIE

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/22/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/22/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/22/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/22/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/23/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

7/28/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Freeway Auto Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Freeway Auto Group Inc. DBA 605 Auto Inc against Defendant Samantha Lee-Marie Delgado on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Freeway Auto Group Inc. on 06/10/2020 for the principal amount of $4,350.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $4,465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/22/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/22/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Freeway Auto Group Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Samantha Lee-Marie Delgado (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/01/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Freeway Auto Group Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Samantha Lee-Marie Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Samantha Lee-Marie Delgado (Defendant) to Samantha Lee-Marie Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Samantha Lee-Marie Delgado (Defendant): First Name changed from Samantah to Samantha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketAddress for Samantha Lee-Marie Delgado (Defendant) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Freeway Auto Group Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Samantah Lee-Marie Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC. is a litigant