This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 00:53:49 (UTC).

FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. VS JAIMES, VICENTE

Case Summary

On 11/05/2015 FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAIMES, VICENTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9518

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC

Defendant

JAIMES VICENTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketOrder CASE FILE DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE. Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. MICHAEL J. PEARCE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketINCOMPLETE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO SE2 RE: SCFD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN DOW402835030. HEARING SET FOR 01/25/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC. is a litigant