This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 02:57:53 (UTC).

FREDERIC, TANAA VS SUNSET SURGERY CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2016 FREDERIC, TANAA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUNSET SURGERY CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0351

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FREDERC TANAA

FREDERIC TANAA

Carmel Valley, CA 93924

Defendants

9201 SUNSET SURGERY CENTER INC.

SURGERY ON SUNSET INC.

9201 Sunset Blvd.

West Hollywood, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Vacate)

7/29/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Vacate)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/29/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

7/29/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/29/2016

7/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/29/2016

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/28/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/28/2016

9/28/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/28/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/28/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/28/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

RETURNED MAIL - - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 28, 2016

10/11/2016: RETURNED MAIL - - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 28, 2016

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/6/2016: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2016
  • Updated -- RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 28, 2016: As To Parties changed to Surgery on Sunset, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 28, 2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Updated -- Surgery on Sunset, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Surgery on Sunet, Inc. to Surgery on Sunset, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/28/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/28/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by FREDERIC, TANAA on 01/05/2016 (from ING16S00351): Defendant Surgery on Sunset, Inc. does not owe the plaintiff (FREDERIC, TANAA) any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Surgery on Sunset, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Sunset Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER RE: PLEASE AMEND JUDGMENT TO REFLECT DEFENDANT'S CURRENT CORPORATE NAME TO SUNSET SURGERY CENTER, INC. FILED BY (FREDERIC, TANAA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (9201 SUNSET SURGERY CENTER, INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/07/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # ING507980002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:07P M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART, PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/17/16 . FOR (FREDERIC, TANAA) . AGAINST (9201 SUNSET SURGERY CENTER, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 7302.25 . COSTS $ 145.00 . TOTAL $ 7447.25 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (9201 SUNSET SURGERY CENTER, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (9201 SUNSET SURGERY CENTER, INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/17/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 . COSTS OF $ 70.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1160108E6724. HEARING SET FOR 03/17/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less