This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2017 at 06:40:53 (UTC).

FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC VS FLORES, MARIA

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4301

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

PAZ YURY

FLORES MARIA

TORRES CLAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • STIPULATED EXTENSION OF THE RESTRICTED ACCESS PERIODS OF SECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • A/C - ANSWER FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • OSC SET 10/18/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant