This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2019 at 10:38:00 (UTC).

FRANKLIN HOLDINGS, LLC., VS BEATRIZ ARIAS

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 FRANKLIN HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BEATRIZ ARIAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9386

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC.

Defendant

ARIAS BEATRIZ

Los Angeles, CA 90037

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS PAUL

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2/22/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

8/29/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/29/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - on Complaint

8/29/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/30/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Beatriz Arias)

8/30/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Beatriz Arias)

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/14/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

9/14/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/20/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

9/20/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

9/26/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Updated -- Writ of Possession: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Possession: Exact Name: Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Franklin Holdings, LLC., (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 33.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Franklin Holdings, LLC., A Calif. Limited Liability Co. against Defendant Beatriz Arias on the Complaint filed by Franklin Holdings, LLC., on 08/29/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 4338 S. Main Street, Los Angeles, CA 90037 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Franklin Holdings, LLC., (Plaintiff); As to: Beatriz Arias (Defendant); Service Date: 09/02/2018; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • Default entered as to Beatriz Arias; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Franklin Holdings, LLC., on 08/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: Franklin Holdings, LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: Franklin Holdings, LLC., (Plaintiff); As to: Beatriz Arias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Franklin Holdings, LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.