This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 16:25:38 (UTC).

FRANKEL T DELOSSANTOS VS FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 FRANKEL T DELOSSANTOS filed an Other lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5424

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELOSSANTOS FRANKEL T

Defendant

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORSKI VINCENT

Defendant Attorney

WERDERITCH LORI LEE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 12/09/2019

12/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 12/09/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees)

12/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees) of 12/20/2019

12/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees) of 12/20/2019

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Demurrer

9/3/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Demurrer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/9/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Reply (name extension) - Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities

9/9/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/1/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF LORI L WERDERITCH

7/8/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF LORI L WERDERITCH

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/6/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/6/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • Hearing06/09/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Hearing02/06/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Plaintiff's Failure to Pay Reclassification Fees scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees) of 12/20/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/20/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re payment of reclassification fees scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 12/09/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FRANKEL T DELOSSANTOS (Plaintiff); As to: FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FRANKEL T DELOSSANTOS (Plaintiff); As to: FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/11/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FRANKEL T DELOSSANTOS (Plaintiff); As to: FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FRANKEL T DELOSSANTOS (Plaintiff); As to: FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FRANKEL T DELOSSANTOS (Plaintiff); As to: FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05424    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 94

Delossantos v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., et al.

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.10, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.’s Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Frankel T. Delossantos (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for equitable expungement and declaratory relief against Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (“Defendant”) and others. The remaining named Defendants have defaulted or been dismissed. Plaintiff filed the instant discovery Motions on April 26, 2019.

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court lacks jurisdiction to grant the relief sought in the Complaint. Specifically, the requests for injunctive and declaratory relief are outside the jurisdiction of this Court. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subds. (a)(7), (b).)

THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

Court clerk to give notice.