This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 07:43:16 (UTC).

FRANK BONVINO VS THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 FRANK BONVINO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4899

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BONVINO FRANK

Defendant

THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMOKOS CHARLES ATTILA

Defendant Attorney

HAMMACK WAYNE HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 09/11/2020

9/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 09/11/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

9/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

9/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 09/15/2020

9/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 09/15/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

9/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Plaintiff's Objection to defendant's motion to enforce the settlement agreement and request for fees; Plaintiff's request to set agreement aside and calendar issues

8/14/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Plaintiff's Objection to defendant's motion to enforce the settlement agreement and request for fees; Plaintiff's request to set agreement aside and calendar issues

Other - (name extension) - Other - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION

7/20/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Standing Order 7/15/2020-In Re Small Claims Protocol for Exchange and Submission of Evidence

7/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Standing Order 7/15/2020-In Re Small Claims Protocol for Exchange and Submission of Evidence

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6/26/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Having Filed Substitution of Attorney Form/Change of Address

6/26/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Having Filed Substitution of Attorney Form/Change of Address

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/8/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Other - (name extension) - Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement by Defendant Three Springs Homeowners Association; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Wayne H. Ha

6/9/2020: Other - (name extension) - Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement by Defendant Three Springs Homeowners Association; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Wayne H. Ha

Other - (name extension) - Propose Order Granting Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement by Defendant Three Springs Homeowners Association

6/9/2020: Other - (name extension) - Propose Order Granting Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement by Defendant Three Springs Homeowners Association

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

Other - (name extension) - Notice of Filing Substitution of Attorney form with court and also notice of Charles Domokos, Esq. Change of Address;

6/8/2020: Other - (name extension) - Notice of Filing Substitution of Attorney form with court and also notice of Charles Domokos, Esq. Change of Address;

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

6/11/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- The Court orders FRANK BONVINO in Defendant's Claim filed by THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. on 01/08/2020 dismissed with prejudice. Refers To Entire Action changed from Yes to No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by FRANK BONVINO on 09/24/2019, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Defendant's Claim filed by THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. on 01/08/2020, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Defendant's Claim filed by THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. on 01/08/2020, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDismissal entered on 02/28/2020, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 09/15/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 09/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/15/2020; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 09/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 02:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/15/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Filed By: FRANK BONVINO (Plaintiff); Result: Hearing Set; Result Date: 10/17/2019; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/17/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: FRANK BONVINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FRANK BONVINO (Plaintiff); As to: THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/28/2019; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: FRANK BONVINO (Plaintiff); As to: THREE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: FRANK BONVINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less