This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 15:35:27 (UTC).

FRANCISCO RECINOS VS JESUS VALENZUELA

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 FRANCISCO RECINOS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JESUS VALENZUELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7329

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RECINOS FRANCISCO

Los Angeles, CA 90007

Defendant

VALENZUELA JESUS

Downey, CA 90242

 

Court Documents

Minute Order of 07/05/2017

7/5/2017: Minute Order of 07/05/2017

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/16/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/16/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/3/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

5/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Result Date changed from 05/01/2017 to 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 07/05/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Francisco Recinos (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 02/24/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Francisco Recinos (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Valenzuela (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Francisco Recinos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Francisco Recinos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: ST-2016-0008403 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less