This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2020 at 10:21:11 (UTC).

FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC VS DADDY'S PEST CONTROL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DADDY'S PEST CONTROL, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4946

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants

CORDELL JOHN ANDREW

DADDY'S PEST CONTROL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER ELIZABETH A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding non Service - Non Estes

9/3/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding non Service - Non Estes

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status

12/26/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/23/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 1033 (b)

1/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 1033 (b)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 585

1/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 585

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status

1/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/23/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

1/23/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/23/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/4/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non Military Status

4/24/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non Military Status

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/24/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons (Joint Debtor) - Summons (Joint Debtor)

4/24/2019: Summons (Joint Debtor) - Summons (Joint Debtor)

Complaint - Complaint

4/24/2019: Complaint - Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. (Defendant); John Andrew Cordell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 585; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 1033 (b); Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Elizabeth A Bleier (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. (Defendant); John Andrew Cordell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to John Andrew Cordell; Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC on 04/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Forwardline Financial, LLC against Defendant John Andrew Cordell and Defendant Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. on the Complaint filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC on 04/24/2019 for the principal amount of $23,393.32 and costs of $605.00 for a total of $23,998.32.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC on 04/24/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC, does 1-5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: John Andrew Cordell (Defendant); Service Date: 06/03/2019; Service Cost: 82.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. (Defendant); John Andrew Cordell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. (Defendant); John Andrew Cordell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (Joint Debtor); Issued and Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. (Defendant); John Andrew Cordell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non Military Status; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daddy's Pest Control, Inc. (Defendant); John Andrew Cordell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less