This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 13:30:12 (UTC).

FORTUNATE TRADERS VS HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 FORTUNATE TRADERS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HONG KONG SUPERMARKET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1406

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORTUNATE TRADERS

Defendants

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONTEREY PARK LTD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2020, Plaintiff's cover sheet and 1st Amended Standing Order

11/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2020, Plaintiff's cover sheet and 1st Amended Standing Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/18/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

1/28/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/4/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Saxypat Luengaalam for plaintiff

2/24/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Saxypat Luengaalam for plaintiff

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2021

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/25/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

9/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/17/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

5/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Fortunate Traders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Fortunate Traders on 05/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Fortunate Traders as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Fortunate Traders (Plaintiff); Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, LTD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Saxypat Luengaalam for plaintiff; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/16/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Fortunate Traders (Plaintiff); As to: Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, LTD (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/16/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Hong Kong Supermarket (Defendant) to Hong Kong Supermarket (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Hong Kong Supermarket (Defendant) to Hong Kong Supermarket (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/02/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAddress for Fortunate Traders (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Fortunate Traders (Plaintiff); As to: Hong Kong Supermarket (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where HONG KONG SUPERMARKET is a litigant