Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 12:19:32 (UTC).

FOREVER XCLUSIVE, LLC VS SHARON SMITH GABOUREL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by FOREVER XCLUSIVE, LLC against SHARON SMITH GABOUREL in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2276

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREVER XCLUSIVE LLC

Defendant

SMITH GABOUREL SHARON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/7/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/08/2019

11/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/08/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/3/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 11/08/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Forever Xclusive, LLC on 09/19/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/08/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Forever Xclusive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sharon Smith Gabourel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Forever Xclusive, LLC on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Forever Xclusive, LLC as to Sharon Smith Gabourel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Forever Xclusive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sharon Smith Gabourel (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Forever Xclusive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sharon Smith Gabourel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less