This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 14:07:26 (UTC).

FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC. VS RAFAEL A. PALOMERA

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAFAEL A PALOMERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4757

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC.

Defendant

PALOMERA RAFAEL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVENTHAL JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/11/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/11/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/11/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/17/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/28/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

12/17/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/16/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

11/5/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/18/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/18/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/18/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/10/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

1/10/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3/4/2021: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest: Status Date changed from 01/07/2022 to 01/10/2022; As To Parties changed from Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant) to Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Status Date changed from 01/07/2022 to 01/10/2022; As To Parties changed from Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant) to Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant); Service Date: 01/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Filed By: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 237.74; Interest Credits: 604.68; Principal Credits: 2,014.87; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 105.74; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Foreman Financial, Inc. against Defendant Rafael A. Palomera on the Complaint filed by Foreman Financial, Inc. on 12/11/2018 for damages of $9,715.16, attorney fees of $672.91, interest of $667.66, and costs of $323.00 for a total of $11,378.73.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael A. Palomera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVENTHAL JONATHAN DAVID