This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 02:25:21 (UTC).

FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC. VS ADAM AUTO SALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADAM AUTO SALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4082

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC.

Defendants

SULAIMAN WASSEM

ADAM AUTO SALES

SULAIMAN WASSEEM DBA ADAM AUTO SALES INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVENTHAL JONATHAN

GARDNER DIXON LEON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/14/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

11/14/2018: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/14/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/14/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

10/30/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

10/30/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Foreman Financial, Inc. on 11/20/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Foreman Financial, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 99 on [ln 28, col 22] with Document:76717086

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Wasseem Sulaiman (Defendant); Bankruptcy Stay Case Type: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Wasseem Sulaiman (Defendant): First Name changed from Wassem to Wasseem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Auto Sales (Defendant); Wassem Sulaiman (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/29/2018; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Wassem Sulaiman (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/29/2018; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Auto Sales (Defendant); Service Date: 11/29/2018; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Auto Sales (Defendant); Wassem Sulaiman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Auto Sales (Defendant); Wassem Sulaiman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Auto Sales (Defendant); Wassem Sulaiman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adam Auto Sales is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARDNER DIXON LEON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVENTHAL JONATHAN DAVID