This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2019 at 15:49:45 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS ORNELAS ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 09/05/2012 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORNELAS ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6607

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendants

ORNELAS ENTERPRISES INC

ORNELAS GRACIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MACDOWELL, TODD A

MACDOWELL TODD A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR USE OF IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS. + DECLARATION FOR USE OF IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS. + PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS FILED AND ENTERED. DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • SUBSERV 09/09/12 DEC DIL ATTACHED MAILED 09/09/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • OSC SET 03/25/13, 0830 AM, DEPT. F46, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED AND COPY GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED AND COPY GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORNELAS ENTERPRISES INC. DBA ORNELAS ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED - TODD A. MACDOWELL