Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:52:19 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS IAN JAMES HOFFMAN

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IAN JAMES HOFFMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2956

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

HOFFMAN IAN JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL TODD A

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4/6/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/4/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/4/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration FOR USE OF IMAGED DOCUMENTS

3/4/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration FOR USE OF IMAGED DOCUMENTS

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

3/5/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Ford Motor Credit Company LLC against Defendant Ian James Hoffman on the Complaint filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 12/28/2020 for the principal amount of $8,950.63, attorney fees of $627.04, and costs of $304.00 for a total of $9,881.67.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 03/04/2021 to 03/05/2021; Result Date changed from 03/05/2021 to 03/05/2021; As To Parties changed from Ian James Hoffman (Defendant) to Ian James Hoffman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ian James Hoffman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration FOR USE OF IMAGED DOCUMENTS; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Ian James Hoffman; On the Complaint filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 12/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 12/28/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, does 1 - 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ian James Hoffman (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/11/2021; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ian James Hoffman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ian James Hoffman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ian James Hoffman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED - TODD A. MACDOWELL