This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2019 at 21:17:29 (UTC).

FLORENCE HARRISON VS FP CONTRACTING, INC., A CALIFO

Case Summary

On 10/24/2012 FLORENCE HARRISON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FP CONTRACTING, INC , A CALIFO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3117

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORENCE HARRISON

Defendants

FP CONTRACTING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FOLCKA RONALD FLOYD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF REYES & BARSOUM - JORGE H REYES

LAW OFFICES OF REYES & BARSOUM - REYES, JORGE H

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF REYES & BARSOUM

REYES JORGE H

Defendant Attorneys

KIRK & ZURAWSKI - JACLYN R SANTANA

KIRK & ZURAWSKI - JACLYN R. SANTANA

Attorney at KIRK & ZURAWSKI

SANTANA JACLYN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2013
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED IN DEPT. 077 HON. JUDGE STEPHANIE M. BOWICK PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. PURSUANT TO THE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED HEREIN, AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2013, 8:30 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT 77. IF A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT COURT DATE, NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED IN DEPT. 077 HON. JUDGE STEPHANIE M. BOWICK PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. PURSUANT TO THE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED HEREIN, AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2013, 8:30 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT 77. IF A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT COURT DATE, NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 09/09/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 077 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM12C03117 TO LAM12CC3117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (FLORENCE HARRISON) A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE . SETTLEMENT 05/09/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketRECEIVED FEES FROM (FP CONTRACTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) IN THE SUM OF $ 150.00 FOR JURY TRIAL . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY DIANA SUMMERHAYES THE CASE MANAGEMENT IS CONTINUED TO 06/05/13. . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/05/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/07/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 00N FOR CONSIDERATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (FP CONTRACTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) , (FOLCKA, RONALD FLOYD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (FP CONTRACTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (FOLCKA, RONALD FLOYD) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SERVED ON 11/07/12 FILED. SERVED AS TO (FOLCKA, RONALD FLOYD) . COSTS OF $ 59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SERVED ON 11/07/12 FILED. SERVED AS TO (FOLCKA, RONALD FLOYD) . COSTS OF $ 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN COM503382048. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/26/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FP CONTRACTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIFENBARK, SURAWSKI & KIRK - JACLYN R. SANTANA