This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 00:58:21 (UTC).

FIVE STAR PLUMBING AND FIRE SUPPLIES, INC. VS IGNACIO RESENDEZ REYES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 FIVE STAR PLUMBING AND FIRE SUPPLIES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IGNACIO RESENDEZ REYES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7614

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

FIVE STAR PLUMBING AND FIRE SUPPLIES INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY INC.

REYES IGNACIO RESENDEZ DBA ADVANTAGE FIRE PROTECTION

REYES IGNACIO RESENDEZ

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

REYES IGNACIO RESENDEZ DBA ADVANTAGE FIRE PROTECTION

FIVE STAR PLUMBING AND FIRE SUPPLIES INC.

GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LION BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DIAZ AN INDIVIDUAL TONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

WAKEFIELD JAMES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PAGAN JOHN M.

PAGAN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/8/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/2/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order to Determine Disposition o...)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order to Determine Disposition o...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order to Determine Disposition o...) of 06/03/2021

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order to Determine Disposition o...) of 06/03/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing to Determine the Disposition of Funds;) of 04/14/2021

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing to Determine the Disposition of Funds;) of 04/14/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing to Determine the Disposition of Funds;)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing to Determine the Disposition of Funds;)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

7/23/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

8/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder

4/22/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

10/17/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/24/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

9/16/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/16/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/18/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. on 09/16/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. as to Glendale Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc., a California corporation, Lion Builders, Inc., a California corporation, Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc., and Tony Diaz , an individual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAddress for John Pagan (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc. on 08/15/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc. as to Ignacio Resendez Reyes and Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. a Florida corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAddress for James Wakefield (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order to Determine Disposition o...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request for Court Order to Determine Disposition o...) of 06/03/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- James Wakefield (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Cummins & White, LLP to WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAddress for James Wakefield (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ignacio Resendez Reyes (Defendant); Service Date: 08/20/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/20/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ignacio Resendez Reyes (Defendant); Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ignacio Resendez Reyes (Defendant); Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Five Star Plumbing and Fire Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ignacio Resendez Reyes (Defendant); Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07614    Hearing Date: August 05, 2020    Dept: 26

Accredited Surety and Casualty Co., Inc. v. Reyes, et al.

MOTION TO DEPOSIT FEES, DISCHARGE LIABILITY, REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES AND RESTRAINING ORDER

(CCP §§ 386, 386.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

ACCREDITED CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, INC.’S MOTION TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER, ETC. IS CONDITIONALLY GRANTED AS TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT’S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR INTERPLEADER. INTERPLEADER FUNDS OF $13,500.00 ARE TO BE DEPOSITED WITH THIRTY (30) DAYS.

A HEARING TO DETERMINE THE DISPOSITION OF FUNDS IS SET FOR JANUARY 13, 2021 AT 10 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. EACH CLAIMANT MUST FILE A WRITTEN CLAIM WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER; THE WRITTEN CLAIM SHOULD INCLUDE A DECLARATION SETTING FORTH THE BASIS FOR THE CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP OR INTEREST. ALL CLAIMANTS MUST ALSO PERSONALLY APPEAR AT THE DISBURSEMENT HEARING. IF NO CLAIMS OR APPEARANCES ARE MADE, THE MATTER WILL BE SET FOR AN OSC RE: ESCHEATING FUNDS. (CODE CIV. PROC., § 128; GOVT. CODE, § 68084.1.)

ACCREDITED CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, INC. IS ORDERED TO GIVE NOTICE OF THIS ORDER AND THE DISBURSEMENT HEARING ON ALL PARTIES, CLAIMANTS AND INTERESTED PARTIES. UPON DEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND FILING OF THE PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE NOTICE OF DISBURSEMENT HEARING, ACCREDITED CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, INC. SHALL BE DISCHARGED OF FURTHER RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE DISPUTED FUNDS.

TRIAL REMAINS SET FOR FEBRUARY 11, 2021 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIVE STAR PLUMBING AND FIRE SUPPLIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant