This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2020 at 22:34:10 (UTC).

FIRST TO SERVE, INC. VS DANIEL NIX

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 FIRST TO SERVE, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DANIEL NIX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2663

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST TO SERVE INC.

Defendant

NIX DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORDOH CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

2/21/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/19/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Writ of Possession

2/19/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/18/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

1/14/2020: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/31/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (DANIEL NIX)

12/31/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (DANIEL NIX)

Complaint - Complaint

12/30/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/30/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/30/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 24.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff FIRST TO SERVE, INC. against Defendant DANIEL NIX on the Complaint filed by FIRST TO SERVE, INC. on 12/30/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 682 S. CORONADO STREET, #417, LOS ANGELES, CA 90057 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application for Writ of Possession: Status Date changed from 02/21/2020 to 02/19/2020; Exact Name: blank; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2020; Service Cost: 67.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to DANIEL NIX; On the Complaint filed by FIRST TO SERVE, INC. on 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Signed and Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FIRST TO SERVE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL NIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First to Serve, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORDOH CRAIG ATTORNEY AT LAW