This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 00:39:46 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA VS UNANYAN, AYK

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNANYAN, AYK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9432

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNANYAN AYK AN INDIVIDUAL

UNANYAN AYK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE DUNNING LAW FIRM - JAMES MACLEOD ESQ

Attorney at THE DUNNING LAW FIRM

MACLEOD JAMES ESQ

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

12/14/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 12/21/2017 ; Status Date changed from 04/13/2017 to 12/21/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA) A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: AYK UNANYAN (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA) A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION , RECEIPT NO. CHA634964054 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # CHA637046036 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 44.84 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT SIGNED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/13/17 . FOR (FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA) A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION . AGAINST (UNANYAN, AYK) AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 4046.77 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 294.00 . TOTAL $ 4,340.77 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO JUDGES CHAMBERS RE: COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE RETAINED BY DEFAULT DESK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (UNANYAN, AYK) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO AYK UNANYAN SUB SERVED ON 010617, MAILED ON 010717 DEC DIL ATTACHED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO SHELF 1 RE: FILE REVIEWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 10/25/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RUPERT A. BYRDSONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA625572038. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less