This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 02:31:19 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DEON RICE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against DEON RICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1835

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondents

RICE ERIKA

RICE DEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GILLIGAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/4/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

6/2/2020: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

6/2/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/2/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/24/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Notice of Motion and Motion on Proposed Order to Deposit Surplus Funds, Discharge Petitioner of Further Responsibility for Disbursing of Funds, and

9/24/2020: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Notice of Motion and Motion on Proposed Order to Deposit Surplus Funds, Discharge Petitioner of Further Responsibility for Disbursing of Funds, and

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS) of 04/20/2021]

4/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS) of 04/20/2021]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS) of 04/20/2021

4/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS) of 04/20/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 10/06/2020

10/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 10/06/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds;)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds;)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/13/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • Hearing12/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause Re: Executive Officer's Compliance of Statutory Notice scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/15/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Executive Officer's Compliance of Statutory Notice scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 07/30/2021; Result Type to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS) of 04/20/2021]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS) of 04/20/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: First American Title Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order Notice of Motion and Motion on Proposed Order to Deposit Surplus Funds, Discharge Petitioner of Further Responsibility for Disbursing of Funds, and Excuse Petitioner from Further Hearings or Participation; Declaration of Michael J. Gilligan scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 10/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: First American Title Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: First American Title Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: Deon Rice (Respondent); Erika Rice (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: First American Title Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: Deon Rice (Respondent); Erika Rice (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP01835    Hearing Date: October 06, 2020    Dept: 26

First American Title Ins. Co. v. Rice, et alPETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE’S SALE

(Civ. Code §§ 2924(c)-(d))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale and for Discharge of Liability is GRANTED EFFECTIVE UPON DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AS ORDERED. PETITIONER TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS OF $3,744.44 WITH THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS IS SET FOR APRIL 20, 2021 AT 10 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On June 2, 2020, Petitioner First American Title Insurance Company (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”). The gross amount of deposit is $6,620.78, without deducting attorney’s fees and expenses.

Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds that it satisfies the requirements of Civ. Code § 2924j. Petitioner also asks for $2,133.50 in attorney’s fees and $742.84 in costs, which totals $2,876.34. (Pet., Gilligan Decl., Exh. A.) However, the declaration erroneously calculates the total fees and costs as $5,089.69 and correspondingly mistakenly calculates the amount to be deposited as $1,531.09. (Id. at ¶3.) The correct amount to be deposited by Petitioner is $3,744.44 ($6,620.78 - $2,876.34 = $3,744.44).

In light of the foregoing, the Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale and for Discharge of Liability is GRANTED EFFECTIVE UPON DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AS ORDERED. PETITIONER IS TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS OF $3,744.44 WITH THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. UPON DEPOSIT OF THE SURPLUS FUNDS AS ORDERED, PETITIONER WILL BE DISCHARGED FROM LIABLITY.

THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS IS SET FOR APRIL 20, 2021 AT 10 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. EACH CLAIMANT MUST FILE A WRITTEN CLAIM WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER; THE WRITTEN CLAIM SHOULD INCLUDE A DECLARATION SETTING FORTH THE BASIS FOR THE CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP OR INTEREST. (CIVIL CODE, § 2924J, SUBD. (D).) ALL CLAIMANTS MUST ALSO PERSONALLY APPEAR AT THE DISBURSEMENT HEARING. IF NO CLAIMS OR APPEARANCES ARE MADE, THE MATTER WILL BE SET FOR AN OSC RE: ESCHEATING FUNDS. (CODE CIV. PROC., § 128; GOVT. CODE, § 68084.1.)

Court clerk to give notice to all parties, claimants and interested parties.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLIGAN MICHAEL