This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 09:20:00 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS IMS CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IMS CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7105

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

IMS CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M

Defendant Attorney

CIMMARUSTI PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/1/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

8/1/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/1/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/6/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/24/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/24/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 03/17/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 02/03/2020

2/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 02/03/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/03/2020

2/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/03/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/26/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

11/26/2019: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Answer - Answer

11/26/2019: Answer - Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 09/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 09/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Type changed from Status Conference to Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 03/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 03/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: IMS Construction Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/16/2019; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: IMS Construction Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: IMS Construction Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: IMS Construction Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CIMMARUSTI PATRICK J.