Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 12:14:23 (UTC).

FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION VS JOSEPH E ALDECOA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSEPH E ALDECOA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8165

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION

Defendants

ALDECOA KELLY L

ALDECOA JOSEPH E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEEDLEMAN BRUCE PAUL

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

12/4/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

12/4/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/4/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

11/13/2020: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/13/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

11/16/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/23/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/14/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/14/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph E Aldecoa (Defendant); Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph E Aldecoa (Defendant); Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Firefighters First Credit Union against Defendant Joseph E Aldecoa and Defendant Kelly L Aldecoa on the Complaint filed by Firefighters First Credit Union on 08/14/2020 for the principal amount of $22,782.42, attorney fees of $1,073.47, interest of $4,951.50, and costs of $529.00 for a total of $29,336.39.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph E Aldecoa (Defendant); Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by Firefighters First Credit Union on 08/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph E Aldecoa (Defendant); Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant); Service Date: 09/01/2020; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant); Service Date: 09/01/2020; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph E Aldecoa (Defendant); Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph E Aldecoa (Defendant); Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph E Aldecoa (Defendant); Kelly L Aldecoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION FKA LOS ANGELES FIREMEN'S CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Needleman, Bruce P.