Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 00:26:21 (UTC).

FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION VS JODI L CRANDALL

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JODI L CRANDALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1725

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION FKA LOS ANGELES FIREMEN'S CREDIT UNION

Defendant

CRANDALL JODI L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEEDLEMAN BRUCE PAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

8/5/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/6/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

3/26/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/26/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/26/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2025
  • Hearing03/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); OSC re: Dismissal Date: 03/27/2025; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jodi L Crandall (Defendant); Service Date: 06/08/2020; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jodi L Crandall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jodi L Crandall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Jodi L Crandall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION FKA LOS ANGELES FIREMEN'S CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Needleman, Bruce P.