Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 21:50:30 (UTC).

FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION VS CHRISTOPHER R. BURR

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER R BURR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5865

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION FKA LOS ANGELES FIREMEN'S CREDIT UNION

Defendant

BURR CHRISTOPHER R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEEDLEMAN BRUCE PAUL

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SAN BERNARDINO)

1/25/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SAN BERNARDINO)

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

12/16/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SAN BERNARDINO)

9/30/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SAN BERNARDINO)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

8/26/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

8/26/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (RIVERSIDE)

8/26/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (RIVERSIDE)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 585

6/9/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 585

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Fee

6/9/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Fee

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/10/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/1/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/7/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/7/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/7/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SAN BERNARDINO); Issued by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant); County: SAN BERNARDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (SAN BERNARDINO): Filed By: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 12/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( ); Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant); Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Graciela Freixes; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SAN BERNARDINO); Issued by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant); County: SAN BERNARDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Graciela Freixes; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (RIVERSIDE); Issued by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant); County: RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Firefighters First Credit Union FKA Los Angeles Firemen's Credit Union against Defendant Christopher R. Burr on the Complaint filed by Firefighters First Credit Union on 02/07/2020 for the principal amount of $16,720.13, attorney fees of $891.60, interest of $1,286.46, and costs of $449.50 for a total of $19,347.69.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant); Service Date: 02/14/2020; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant); Service Date: 02/14/2020; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Firefighters First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher R. Burr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIREFIGHTERS FIRST CREDIT UNION FKA LOS ANGELES FIREMEN'S CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Needleman, Bruce P.