This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2018 at 13:37:14 (UTC).

FINANCIAL PARTNERS CREDIT UNION VS ADAM DOUGLAS RODGERS

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 FINANCIAL PARTNERS CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADAM DOUGLAS RODGERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0948

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCIAL PARTNERS CREDIT UNION

7800 E Imperial Hwy,

Downey, CA 90241

Defendant

RODGERS ADAM DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

(Non-Jury Trial)

2/13/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

1/10/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/23/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/21/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Rejection]

12/1/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Unknown

12/1/2017: Unknown

[Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

11/21/2017: [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Unknown

11/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/23/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/23/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Financial Partners Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Financial Partners Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Douglas Rodgers (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Financial Partners Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01/02/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Financial Partners Credit Union (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Financial Partners Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Douglas Rodgers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less