Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 02:56:33 (UTC).

FINANCE UNIT, LLC VS KARL MIDDLETON

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 FINANCE UNIT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARL MIDDLETON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0281

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FINANCE UNIT LLC

ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE UNIT LLC

Defendant

MIDDLETON KARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOEB STEVEN SCOTT

BENSAMOCHAN ERIC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

5/21/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Request for Dismissal

5/21/2018: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

5/21/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Judgment

7/18/2018: Judgment

Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/9/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/23/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/21/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 8,552.55; Interest: 46.80; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Middleton (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 46.80; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC against Defendant Karl Middleton on the Complaint filed by Finance Unit, LLC on 11/13/2017 for damages of $8,262.55 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $8,552.55.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Eric Bensamochan (Attorney); As to: Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Middleton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Default entered as to Karl Middleton; On the Complaint filed by Finance Unit, LLC on 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Middleton (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Updated -- Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Finance Unit, LLC to Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Middleton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Finance Unit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less