This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2019 at 13:58:00 (UTC).

FERRELLHART INC. VS TEK MEDIA GROUP, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 FERRELLHART INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TEK MEDIA GROUP, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1600

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FERRELL JOHN D

FERRELLHART INC.

Defendant

TEK MEDIA GROUP A CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 04/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/24/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 04/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/24/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Michael Shank for Tek Media Group et al

4/24/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Michael Shank for Tek Media Group et al

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by J. Daniel Ferrell for plaintiff

4/24/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by J. Daniel Ferrell for plaintiff

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/23/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

2/23/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/24/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ferrellhart Inc. against Defendant Tek Media Group, a corporation on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Ferrellhart Inc. on 03/07/2017 for the principal amount of $924.66 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $974.66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Michael Shank for Tek Media Group et al; Filed by: Tek Media Group, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by J. Daniel Ferrell for plaintiff; Filed by: Ferrellhart Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ferrellhart Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Tek Media Group, a corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ferrellhart Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Tek Media Group, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Docket** Case Name changed from JOHN D FERRELL vs TEK MEDIA GROUP, A CORPORATION to FERRELLHART INC. vs TEK MEDIA GROUP, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170223E0446 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170223E0446 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: John D Ferrell (Plaintiff); As to: Tek Media Group, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less