This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 23:48:10 (UTC).

FERNANDA JEREZ VS CESARIO RIVERA

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 FERNANDA JEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESARIO RIVERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9947

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEREZ FERNANDA

Defendant

RIVERA CESARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

AYRAPETYAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

VALDEZ LARRY T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

4/21/2021: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

4/21/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/25/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Fernanda Jerez on 11/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Fernanda Jerez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAddress for Arutyun Topchyan (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Cesario Rivera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Cesario Rivera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Fernanda Jerez (Plaintiff); As to: Cesario Rivera (Defendant); Service Date: 12/28/2020; Service Cost: 63.36; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fernanda Jerez (Plaintiff); As to: Cesario Rivera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fernanda Jerez (Plaintiff); As to: Cesario Rivera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Fernanda Jerez (Plaintiff); As to: Cesario Rivera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALDEZ LARRY T.