This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 14:56:04 (UTC).

FELIX RODRIGUEZ VS MANGEN GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2017 FELIX RODRIGUEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MANGEN GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4410

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ FELIX

Defendant

MANGEN GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/31/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

11/27/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/27/2017: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/27/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/27/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Felix Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Felix Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Felix Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Mangen Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Felix Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANGEN GROUP INC. is a litigant