This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2019 at 00:26:27 (UTC).

FEDEX COPORATE SERVICES INC VS WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 FEDEX COPORATE SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERYL M. BEASLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9752

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SHERYL M. BEASLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDEX COPORATE SERVICES INC

Defendant

WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUI LONG K

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/29/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint

8/29/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

8/29/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES )

8/13/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES )

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

7/17/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

7/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP 1033

7/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP 1033

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/15/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/15/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/15/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

7/15/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/15/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES ); Issued by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution Inc (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 6186.24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Fedex Coporate Services Inc against Defendant West Coast Distribution Inc a California Corporation on the Complaint filed by Fedex Coporate Services Inc on 08/29/2018 for the principal amount of $4,232.28, attorney fees of $1,000.00, interest of $523.96, and costs of $430.00 for a total of $6,186.24.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration RE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/31/2018; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fedex Coporate Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Sheryl M. Beasley in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less