This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2013 at 10:46:03 (UTC).

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE VS. CASTANEDA, PAUL CHOBOLLA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2012 FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASTANEDA, PAUL CHOBOLLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0658

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION ITS ASSIGNEE AND/OR SU

Defendant

CASTANEDA PAUL CHOBOLLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP - MISHAELA GRAVES ESQ

Defendant Attorney

REALTY ATTORNEY GROUP, APC - TRACY, GARY D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. COMM.JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S)APPEARING BY RICHARD H. COOMBS, JR., ESQ., .DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING BY JOHN PETERSEN, ESQ., . **WRITOF POSSESSION MAY BE ISSUED FORTHWITH BUT NO FINALLOCKOUT PRIOR TO 10/10/12**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/17/12 , FOR (FEDERAL HOME LOANMORTGAGE CORPORATION) ITS ASSIGNEE AND/OR SUCCESSORS ,AGAINST (CASTANEDA, PAUL CHOBOLLA) , FOR RESTITUTION OFTHE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 352 PAMELA KAY LANE, LA PUENTE,CA 91746 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMEDOCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.**WRIT OF POSSESSION MAY BE ISSUED FORTHWITH BUT NO FINALLOCKOUT PRIOR TO 10/10/12**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. COMM.JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. MATTERCONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 09/17/12 AT 01:30P M, INDEPT. 001 . **MATTER CONTINUED ON COURTS OWN MOTION**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 09/10/12AT 01:30P M., IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TORESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEFILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OFLOCATION; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO(CASTANEDA, PAUL CHOBOLLA) . COSTS OF $ 140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OFLOCATION; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF FILED. SERVED AS TO ALLUNKNOWN OCCUPANTS C/O PAUL CHOBOLLA CASTENADA . COSTS OF$ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALLOCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CASTANEDA, PAUL CHOBOLLA) . RECEIPT #ELM524875024 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM136007003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less