This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2021 at 01:07:19 (UTC).

FARZAD HAJIMORADI VS STEVE GANDARA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 FARZAD HAJIMORADI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVE GANDARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6185

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAJIMORADI FARZAD

Defendants

RASIER-CA LLC

RASIER LLC

GANDARA STEVE

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALEY ROBIN ELIOT

Defendant Attorneys

O'MEARA JOHN

KUSTIC SARENA L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant, St...)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant, St...)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Defendant, Steve Gandaras Ex Parte Application to Advance Continue Hearing Date for Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or Alternatively, Co

3/24/2021: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Defendant, Steve Gandaras Ex Parte Application to Advance Continue Hearing Date for Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or Alternatively, Co

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant, Steve Gandaras Ex...)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant, Steve Gandaras Ex...)

Answer - Answer

3/29/2021: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

3/29/2021: Answer - Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

10/27/2020: Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/13/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to continue trial and related Motion/Discovery dates

8/18/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to continue trial and related Motion/Discovery dates

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

8/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of New Venue and Amended Proof of Service of Motion To Be Relieved as Counsel

2/24/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of New Venue and Amended Proof of Service of Motion To Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/3/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Complaint - Complaint

6/28/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/28/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Gandara (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Farzad Hajimoradi on 06/28/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Steve Gandara (Defendant); Rasier-CA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier LLC (Defendant); Uber Technologies, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant, St...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant, St...) of 04/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant, Steve Gandara?s Ex Parte Application to Advance Continue Hearing Date for Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or Alternatively, Continue Trial scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rasier LLC (Defendant); As to: Farzad Hajimoradi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 05/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Steve Gandara (Defendant); As to: Farzad Hajimoradi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Farzad Hajimoradi (Plaintiff); As to: Steve Gandara (Defendant); Rasier-CA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Farzad Hajimoradi (Plaintiff); As to: Steve Gandara (Defendant); Rasier-CA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Farzad Hajimoradi (Plaintiff); As to: Steve Gandara (Defendant); Rasier-CA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06185    Hearing Date: February 03, 2021    Dept: 26

Hajimoradi v. Gandara, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Steve Gandara’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Farzad Hajimoradi to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Farzad Hajimoradi to Respond to Request for Production, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Steve Gandara (“Defendant Gandara”) propounded Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production, on Plaintiff Aries Phillips (“Plaintiff”) on November 22, 2019. (Motions, Coy Decl., Exh. A.) Following Plaintiff’s failure to provide timely responses, Defendant extended the deadline to serve verified responses but was advised by Plaintiff’s counsel at the time that he was unable to contract Plaintiff. (Id. at Exhs. B-C.) The Court granted Plaintiff’s counsel’s motion to withdraw on October 15, 2020. (Minute Order, 10/15/20.) Defendant Gandara filed the instant Motions to Compel Responses and Request for Sanctions on January 7, 2021. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Based on the Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the propounded discovery, Defendant Gandara is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to serve verified responses to the form interrogatories and request for production without objections.

Plaintiff’s failure to timely respond constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030 and have been properly noticed for each motion. However, the amount sought is excessive under a lodestar calculation. The request for sanctions is granted against Plaintiff in the total amount of $510.00 based on two hours of attorney time billed at $195.00 an hour and $120.00 in costs. (Motions, Coy Decl., ¶7.)

Conclusion

Defendant Steve Gandara’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Farzad Hajimoradi to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Farzad Hajimoradi to Respond to Request for Production, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC06185    Hearing Date: October 15, 2020    Dept: 26

Hajimoradi v. Gandara, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Robin E. Paley, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Farzad Hajimoradi is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF CORRECTED AND SIGNED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALEY ROBIN ELIOT