Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2019 at 01:17:50 (UTC).

FARRY DOEUM ALEXANDER VS TURTLE GROUP CAPITAL, INC. OR SUNSET ROSE APARTMENTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by FARRY DOEUM ALEXANDER against TURTLE GROUP CAPITAL, INC OR SUNSET ROSE APARTMENTS, LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3780

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER FARRY DOEUM

Defendant

TURTLE GROUP CAPITAL INC. OR SUNSET ROSE APARTMENTS LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2019

1/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2019

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/5/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

12/5/2018: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Farry Doeum Alexander on 11/26/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 01/29/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/29/2019 08:30 AM at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Farry Doeum Alexander (Plaintiff); As to: Turtle Group Capital, Inc. or Sunset Rose Apartments, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less