This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2020 at 01:05:11 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5926

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON LEGAL APC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

7/5/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

7/5/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/5/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/28/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2017: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff); As to: Does: I-V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE against Defendant LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC on the Complaint filed by FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE on 05/09/2017 for damages of $3,635.73, interest of $334.60, and costs of $485.00 for a total of $4,455.33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE on 05/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE on 05/09/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does I-V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff); As to: LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC; On the Complaint filed by FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE on 05/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff); As to: LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/09/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 05/11/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - AUTO Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less