Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 13:30:27 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS CESAR AGUSTIN PANJOJ

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR AGUSTIN PANJOJ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3383

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

PANJOJ CESAR AGUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN MARY

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/11/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/11/2018: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

9/11/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

9/11/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/1/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

10/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Does: I-V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange on 10/18/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does I-V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Farmers Insurance Exchange against Defendant Cesar Agustin Panjoj on the Complaint filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange on 10/18/2017 for damages of $9,572.27, interest of $877.68, and costs of $290.50 for a total of $10,740.45.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange on 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Cesar Agustin Panjoj; On the Complaint filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange on 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Agustin Panjoj (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/30/2017; Service Cost: 65.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Agustin Panjoj (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M